This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/23/2023 at 03:26:22 (UTC).

Juan Grieben, et al Plaintiff vs. Fashion Nova Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Juan Grieben, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Fashion Nova Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4573

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grieben, Juan

Pressley, Tynikal

Defendant

Fashion Nova Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiraldo, Manuel S

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

9/29/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

11/9/2022 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

10/19/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118513760

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less