This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/04/2020 at 12:40:20 (UTC).

JOSH HANSON Plaintiff vs. CAROL THOMAS Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 JOSH HANSON Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAROL THOMAS Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DeLuca, Steven P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0647

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DeLuca, Steven P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANSON, JOSH

Defendant

THOMAS, CAROL

 

Court Documents

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

9/6/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Mediation Report

9/6/2018 - Mediation Report

Pluries Summons Returned Served

8/6/2018 - Pluries Summons Returned Served

Notice of Resetting Pretrial

7/20/2018 - Notice of Resetting Pretrial

Alias Summons Returned Unserved

7/20/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Unserved

Alias Summons Returned Unserved

4/20/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Unserved

Notice of Resetting Pretrial

3/16/2018 - Notice of Resetting Pretrial

Summons Returned Unserved

2/26/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

2/19/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Statement of Claim

1/19/2018 - Statement of Claim

Joint Stipulation & Order

9/6/2018 - Joint Stipulation & Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionJoint Stipulation & Order; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115316001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPluries Summons Returned Served; 7/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Resetting Pretrial; 8/27/18 9:00 AM Rm 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Returned Unserved; (this is the orginal alias summons returned)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOSH HANSON ; Userid: CTS-rmccutcheon ; Receipt: 20182YF2B000447; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketPluries Summons Issued; to pl

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued; to pl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOSH HANSON ; Userid: CTS-rmccutcheon ; Receipt: 20182YF2B000090; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Resetting Pretrial; 4/23/18 9:00 AM Rm 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant THOMAS, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; THE CLERK SHALL RESET PRETRIAL PENDING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOSH HANSON ; Userid: CTS-cmendozbarbosa ; Receipt: 20182YF2C000127; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to BSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOSH HANSON ; Userid: CTS-cmendozbarbosa ; Receipt: 20182YF2C000127; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less