This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/26/2023 at 20:20:34 (UTC).

Jordan T Spohn Plaintiff vs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 Jordan T Spohn Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7868

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spohn, Jordan T

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frachtman, Joshua David

Defendant Attorney

Benson, Charles E, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

5/25/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Agreed Order

5/25/2023 - Agreed Order

Motion for Protective Order

5/15/2023 - Motion for Protective Order

Request for Compulsory Physical Examination

5/12/2023 - Request for Compulsory Physical Examination

Notice of Production From Non-Party

3/8/2023 - Notice of Production From Non-Party

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

2/2/2023 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

2/2/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

2/2/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

1/26/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Admissions

1/12/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

1/12/2023 - Request to Produce

Affidavit of Service

12/14/2022 - Affidavit of Service

eSummons Issuance

12/7/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

12/7/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Civil Cover Sheet

12/6/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

12/6/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/6/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

12/6/2022 - Request for Production

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Taking Deposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Agreed Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion for Protective Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Compulsory Physical Examination

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Production From Non-Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Response to Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Admissions; Additional Text; TO PLAINTIFF; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request to Produce; Additional Text; TO PLAINTIFF; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Affidavit of Service; Additional Text; 8th day of December, 2022; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; none

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Spohn, Jordan T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Spohn, Jordan T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Production; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Spohn, Jordan T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less