This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/27/2022 at 17:53:29 (UTC).

John Calla Plaintiff vs. U.S. Security Associates, Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 John Calla Plaintiff filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against U S Security Associates, Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8256

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calla, John

Defendant

U.S. Security Associates, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Georges-Pierre, Anthony Maximillien

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

6/6/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/6/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

6/7/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

eSummons Issuance

6/9/2022 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TO: U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC d/Wa UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC d/Wa ALLIED UNIVERSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Calla, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE, ESQ