This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/23/2022 at 03:52:57 (UTC).

Jerry Wieczorek Plaintiff vs. Holy Cross Hospital Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Jerry Wieczorek Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Holy Cross Hospital Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1479

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wieczorek, Jerry

Defendants

Holy Cross Hospital Inc

Holy Cross Medic Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patti, Thomas J

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th Street, Ste. 1744

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Request

2/28/2022 - Request

eSummons Issuance

2/28/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/28/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/28/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order Of Recusal

3/10/2022 - Order Of Recusal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Of Recusal; randomly to another division in County Civil Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holy Cross Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patti, Thomas J, ESQ