This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/30/2021 at 16:16:39 (UTC).

Jeffrey Kalpajian Plaintiff vs. Holy Cross Hospital, Inc.,, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Jeffrey Kalpajian Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Holy Cross Hospital, Inc ,, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1359

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kalpajian, Jeffrey

Defendants

Gutierrez, DPT, Stanley

Holy Cross Hospital, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Koppel, Wayne S

Attorney at Koppel & Associates, P.A

817 South University Drive, Suite 100

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

Brown, Christine A

Attorney at Billing Cochran Lyles Mauro & Ramsey PA

515 E Las Olas Blvd, 6Th Fl

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Morgan Jr, Kenneth W, ESQ.

Attorney at Billing Cochran Lyles Mauro & Ramsey PA

Suntrust Center, Sixth Floor, 515 East Las Olas Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Morgan, Kenneth William, Jr.

Attorney at Billing Cochran Lyles Mauro & Ramsey, P.A

Suntrust Center, 6Th Floor, 515 E Las Olas Blvd Fl 6

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-2296

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

1/20/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/20/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Interrogatories

1/20/2021 - Interrogatories

Request to Produce

1/20/2021 - Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

1/20/2021 - Request for Admissions

Complaint (eFiled)

1/20/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

1/20/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

1/21/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Summons Returned Served

1/26/2021 - Summons Returned Served

Acceptance of Service

1/27/2021 - Acceptance of Service

Notice of Appearance

1/27/2021 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Holy Cross Hospital, Inc.,; Party: Defendant Gutierrez, DPT, Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance of Service; Party: Defendant Gutierrez, DPT, Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 01/26/21; Party: Defendant Holy Cross Hospital, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Kalpajian, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANTS, HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL, INC. d/b/a HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL and STANLEY GUTIERREZ, DPT; Party: Plaintiff Kalpajian, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS, HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL, INC. d/b/a HOLY CROSS HOSPITAL and STANLEY GUTIERREZ, DPT; Party: Plaintiff Kalpajian, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; TO DEFENDANT, STANLEY GUTIERREZ, DPT; Party: Plaintiff Kalpajian, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Holy Cross Hospital, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Gutierrez, DPT, Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holy Cross Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Christine Anne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Jr, Kenneth W, ESQ.