This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 10:07:54 (UTC).

Jamaica Bay East Management Co., Inc. Plaintiff vs. Wayne Myers, etal Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 Jamaica Bay East Management Co , Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Wayne Myers, etal Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilman, Allison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1743

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gilman, Allison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jamaica Bay East Management Co., Inc.

Paradise Village

Defendants

Myers, Wayne

Myers, Lois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hinden, Jon Alexander

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

3/13/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

3/14/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/14/2023 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; WAYNE MYERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; LOIS MYERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less