This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 16:08:48 (UTC).

Jamaica Bay East Management Co Inc Plaintiff vs. Danny O Mata-Cruz, etal Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Jamaica Bay East Management Co Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Danny O Mata-Cruz, etal Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jamaica Bay East Management Co Inc

Paradise Village

Defendants

Mata-Cruz, Danny O

Cruz-Tirado, Michael Oneil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hinden, Jon Alexander

4430 Sw 64 Avenue

Davie, FL 33314

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

1/9/2023 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Complaint (eFiled)

1/5/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

1/5/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118611530

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less