This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 20:25:43 (UTC).

Jacksonville Injury and Rehab LLC Plaintiff vs. Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Jacksonville Injury and Rehab LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2528

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacksonville Injury and Rehab LLC

Sobrado, Manuel

Defendant

Windhaven Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barber, Matthew C, ESQ.

Attorney at Matthew C Barber PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd #304

Plantation, FL 33322-4007

Defendant Attorney

Hershey, Colin

Po Box 269015

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

1/24/2020 - Notice of Filing

Order Setting Case Management Conference

10/28/2019 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Response to Request for Admissions

8/27/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Privilege Log

8/27/2019 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Production

8/27/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Motion to Compel Discovery

8/21/2019 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

4/24/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/24/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Production

4/24/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

4/24/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Deposition

4/24/2019 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Notice of Filing

4/24/2019 - Notice of Filing

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/13/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

4/4/2019 - Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

3/28/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Amended Complaint

3/14/2019 - Amended Complaint

e-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial

3/14/2019 - e-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/6/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; RESPONSES; Party: Plaintiff Jacksonville Injury and Rehab LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Compelling Discovery; Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (Granted. The Defendant shall comply with the original discovery demand within 10 days from the date of this Order, failing which sanctions may be imposed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A038845; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Dockete-Summons Issuance - On Amended Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A021086; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A021086; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACKSONVILLE INJURY & REHAB, LLC A/A/O ALYSSA FAUCETT is a litigant

Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSHEY , COLIN MICHAEL