This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 21:27:17 (UTC).

Inverrary Rentals LLC Plaintiff vs. Valry Yvonne Turner Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Inverrary Rentals LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Valry Yvonne Turner Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7694

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inverrary Rentals LLC

Defendant

Turner, Valry Yvonne

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

1/11/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Letter to Judge

1/10/2019 - Letter to Judge

Notice of Change of Address

1/10/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Writ of Possession Returned Served

9/7/2018 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

Notice Setting Mediation

8/30/2018 - Notice Setting Mediation

Order Referring Case to Mediation

8/21/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Order Granting Motion to Stay Writ

8/21/2018 - Order Granting Motion to Stay Writ

Motion

8/20/2018 - Motion

Copy of Receipt for Rent

8/20/2018 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

8/20/2018 - Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

Motion

8/20/2018 - Motion

Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

8/20/2018 - Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

Non-Military Affidavit

8/14/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

8/6/2018 - Order Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg

Answer to Tenant Eviction

8/3/2018 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Complaint

7/31/2018 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

7/31/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Default Judgment for Eviction

8/15/2018 - Default Judgment for Eviction

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter to Judge; /x; Party: Defendant Turner, Valry Yvonne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Party: Defendant Turner, Valry Yvonne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketFunds Disbursed Per Ord; PL $1900.00 Ck#97551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionJt Stip & Ord Approving Stip; Comment (Monies in the Ct Reg to be disburse to Pltf ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115308322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Setting Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Stay Writ; (Granted and the Writ of Possession is stayed until further Order of this court. Hearing on this matter shall be set after the parties attend post-jgmt mediation if not settled.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Requiring Rent Money Into Ct Reg; of $1900.00 on or before NOON (12PM) 8/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction; X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: INVERRARY RENTALS LLC ; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001049; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: INVERRARY RENTALS LLC ; Userid: CTS-vlopez ; Receipt: 20183YF3E001049; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less