This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/19/2020 at 14:48:33 (UTC).

Inverrary Gardens Condo II Assn Inc Plaintiff vs. Natasha L McBean Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 Inverrary Gardens Condo II Assn Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Natasha L McBean Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0829

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inverrary Gardens Condo II Assn Inc

Defendant

McBean, Natasha L

 

Court Documents

Electronic Sale Fee Invoice Billed

10/25/2017 - Electronic Sale Fee Invoice Billed

Order Disbursing Funds

9/26/2017 - Order Disbursing Funds

Re-Notice of Hearing

8/28/2017 - Re-Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

8/17/2017 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Disbursement

8/17/2017 - Motion for Disbursement

Certificate of Title

8/14/2017 - Certificate of Title

Certificate of Disbursements

8/14/2017 - Certificate of Disbursements

Bid Sheet

8/1/2017 - Bid Sheet

Certificate of Sale

8/1/2017 - Certificate of Sale

Affidavit

5/24/2017 - Affidavit

Assignment of Bid

5/24/2017 - Assignment of Bid

Proof of Publication

5/16/2017 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

5/2/2017 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Notice of Hearing

3/27/2017 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/27/2017 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Default & Default

3/15/2017 - Motion for Default & Default

Non-Military Affidavit

3/15/2017 - Non-Military Affidavit

Proof of Publication

2/22/2017 - Proof of Publication

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Sale Fee Invoice Billed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCheck Paid; to David A Kupperman Atty Tr Acct per ord ($34,624.56) mailed & Brenda D Forman ($15.00) serv chg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCheck Paid; to Inverrary Gardens Condo II Assn Inc per cert of disb ($8,819.47); Frank Weinberg & Black PL per cert of disb ($2,812.97) mailed & Brenda D Forman ($28.00) surp educate fund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketRe-open Fee; Payor: DAVID ALAN KUPPERMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A118790; Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Monday, August &$-2017, at 8:45-am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Disbursement; SURPLUS REFUND CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Disbursements

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search; ANDREW KARP, of STREETWISE INVESTIGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit for Service by Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: NEIL G FRANK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A160260; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: NEIL G FRANK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A160260; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: NEIL G FRANK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A160260; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Inverrary Gardens Condo II Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant McBean, Natasha L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknow Spouse of Natasha L. McBean

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc is a litigant