This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/20/2020 at 01:23:30 (UTC).

Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc Plaintiff vs. Uvo Ologboride Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Uvo Ologboride Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1414

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc

Defendants

Ologboride, Uvo

Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Estevez, Matthew

Attorney at Matthew Estevez PA

9600 Nw 25 St Ste 2A

Doral, FL 33172-1416

Montekio, Michelle, ESQ.

Attorney at Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A.

Cumberland Building, Suite 710, 800 East Broward Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Stiberman, Robert A

Attorney at Stiberman Law, P.A.

2601 Hollywood Blvd.

Hollywood, FL 33020

Kalmanson, Barry

500 North Maitland Avenue, Suite 305

Maitland, FL 32751-0000

 

Court Documents

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

11/4/2019 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Order

9/24/2019 - Order

Order Setting Case Management Conference

9/24/2019 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Order Denying

8/29/2019 - Order Denying

Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel

8/22/2019 - Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Hearing By Judge

8/21/2019 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Motion to Vacate Final Judgment

7/9/2019 - Motion to Vacate Final Judgment

Order Placing Case on Reopened Inactive Status

8/23/2018 - Order Placing Case on Reopened Inactive Status

Appeal Record Completed

8/10/2018 - Appeal Record Completed

Acknowledgment

6/25/2018 - Acknowledgment

Notice of Appeal

6/21/2018 - Notice of Appeal

Notice of Filing

5/2/2018 - Notice of Filing

Re-Notice of Hearing

4/11/2018 - Re-Notice of Hearing

Response to Motion for Judgment

1/19/2018 - Response to Motion for Judgment

Answer

1/17/2017 - Answer

eSummons Issuance

12/23/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Motion for Extension of Time

12/19/2016 - Motion for Extension of Time

Stipulation for Dismissal

12/15/2017 - Stipulation for Dismissal

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Disbursements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBid Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; DANNY CHIPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Ologboride, Uvo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Party: Defendant Ologboride, Uvo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 12/01/16; Party: Defendant Ologboride, Uvo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MICHELLE MONTEKIO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A166055; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHELLE MONTEKIO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A166055; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Defendant, Uvo Ologboride

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNBELT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Ariel Stiberman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kalmanson, Barry