This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/15/2020 at 00:19:25 (UTC).

Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc Plaintiff vs. Althea Kenton Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Althea Kenton Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7017

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc

Defendants

Kenton, Althea

Estate of Floy Kenton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Montekio, Michelle, ESQ.

Attorney at Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A.

Cumberland Building, Suite 710, 800 East Broward Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

9/14/2016 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/14/2016 - Complaint (eFiled)

Lis Pendens

9/14/2016 - Lis Pendens

eSummons Issuance

9/14/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

11/1/2016 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Comment (AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 114022346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MICHELLE MONTEKIO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A132818; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MICHELLE MONTEKIO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A132818; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Inverrary Gardens Condo I Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Kenton, Althea

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inverrary Gardens Condo Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Montekio, Michelle, ESQ.