This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 04:33:05 (UTC).

Inverrary 441Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. Juan Miguel Serra Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Inverrary 441Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Juan Miguel Serra Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eves, Tabitha Blackmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3320

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eves, Tabitha Blackmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendant

Serra, Juan Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duarte, Maria Cristina

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

1/23/2023 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

Order Disbursing Funds

1/5/2023 - Order Disbursing Funds

Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

1/3/2023 - Motion to Stay Writ of Possession

Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

1/3/2023 - Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ

Motion for Disbursement

12/29/2022 - Motion for Disbursement

Notice of Appearance

12/14/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

12/14/2022 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Affidavit of Non-Payment

12/14/2022 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Summons Returned Served

12/7/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Answer to Tenant Eviction

12/5/2022 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Copy of Receipt for Rent

12/5/2022 - Copy of Receipt for Rent

Certificate of Mailing

12/2/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

eSummons Issuance

11/23/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Default Judgment for Eviction

12/16/2022 - Default Judgment for Eviction

Civil Cover Sheet

11/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint (eFiled)

11/22/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ of Possession Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Disbursing Funds; Additional Text; in Court Registry to Pltf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Stay Writ of Possession; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Serra, Juan Miguel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Comment:; Additional Text; Order on Mo/stay scanned to Judge Feld

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Denying Motion to Stay Writ; Additional Text; -Emailed to BSO and Deft called.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Writ of Possession Issued to BSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Disbursement; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Default Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118577577

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Tenant Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Copy of Receipt for Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pleadings Sent Up To Judge; Additional Text; Answer to tenant eviction and Copy of rent receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Comment:; Additional Text; Answer retd from Judge--Seen, No Action (Nov rent due in Nov, Dec rent due now)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Additional Text; DESIGNATING AUTHORITY TO PROPERTY MANAGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; FOR TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less