This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/06/2023 at 22:51:04 (UTC).

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. Michael Eugene Myers, Jr. Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Eugene Myers, Jr Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eves, Tabitha Blackmon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2942

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eves, Tabitha Blackmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendant

Myers, Michael Eugene, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

10/31/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Complaint (eFiled)

10/19/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Non-Military Affidavit

10/19/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit

10/19/2022 - Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

10/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

10/24/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Certificate of Mailing

10/27/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118492936

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Myers, Michael Eugene, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Myers, Michael Eugene, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Additional Text; DESIGNATING AUTHORITY TO PROPERTY MANAGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less