This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 08:57:02 (UTC).

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. Mariah Hannah Bauer Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mariah Hannah Bauer Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3662

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendant

Bauer, Mariah Hannah

 

Court Documents

Non-Military Affidavit

12/23/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint (eFiled)

12/23/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Affidavit

12/23/2022 - Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

12/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Voluntary Dismissal

1/10/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

eSummons Issuance

12/23/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Certificate of Mailing

12/30/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

1/5/2023 - Summons Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118613108

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less