This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 04:30:18 (UTC).

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. LILNERVIA EVETT SEWEL Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LILNERVIA EVETT SEWEL Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evans, Kal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3315

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evans, Kal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendant

SEWEL, LILNERVIA EVETT

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

11/22/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Non-Military Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

11/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order Approving Settlement

12/15/2022 - Order Approving Settlement

eSummons Issuance

11/23/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Motion for Approval

12/2/2022 - Motion for Approval

Stipulation

12/2/2022 - Stipulation

Certificate of Mailing

12/2/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

12/6/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Motion

12/14/2022 - Motion

Stipulation for-of Settlement

12/14/2022 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Order Approving Settlement; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118574995

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation for-of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion; Additional Text; to approve stipulation; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pleadings Sent Up To Judge; Additional Text; order approving stipulation/ order of dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 11/29/2022; Party: Defendant SEWEL, LILNERVIA EVETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Additional Text; AND SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Approval; Additional Text; STIPULATION; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Additional Text; DESIGNATING AUTHORITY TO PROPERTY MANAGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; FOR TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less