This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 20:17:27 (UTC).

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. Jermesha Marie Hicks, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Jermesha Marie Hicks, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3176

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendants

Hicks, Jermesha Marie

Franklin, Edward Titus

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment for Eviction

3/8/2019 - Default Judgment for Eviction

eSummons Issuance

2/20/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/20/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Non-Military Affidavit

2/20/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint (eFiled)

2/20/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/20/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing

2/26/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

2/26/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

2/27/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/27/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Affidavit of Costs

3/4/2019 - Affidavit of Costs

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

3/4/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Motion for Default & Default

3/4/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Affidavit of Non-Payment

3/4/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Writ of Possession Returned Served

4/9/2019 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served; 03-22-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115663104

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; default jgmt package

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Payment; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Defendant(s): JERMESHA MARIE HICKS & EDWARD TITUS FRANKLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; Party: Plaintiff Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 02-23-19; Party: Defendant Hicks, Jermesha Marie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Hicks, Jermesha Marie; Party: Defendant Franklin, Edward Titus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Hicks, Jermesha Marie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Franklin, Edward Titus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: LYNN H ZOVLUCK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A027728; Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LYNN H ZOVLUCK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A027728; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LYNN H ZOVLUCK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A027728; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inverrary 441 Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where Inverrary 441 Trust, LLC is a litigant