This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 04:34:47 (UTC).

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff vs. Alexus Pinckney Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Inverrary 441 Trust LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Alexus Pinckney Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3322

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Inverrary 441 Trust LLC

Inverrary 441 Apartments

Defendant

Pinckney, Alexus

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

11/22/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Non-Military Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

11/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Final Judgment for Eviction

12/14/2022 - Final Judgment for Eviction

eSummons Issuance

11/23/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Certificate of Mailing

12/2/2022 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Returned Served

12/7/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

12/7/2022 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Motion for Default & Default

12/7/2022 - Motion for Default & Default

Affidavit of Non-Payment

12/7/2022 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Writ of Possession Returned Served

1/23/2023 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ of Possession Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Writ of Possession Issued to BSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Final Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118574015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pleadings Sent Up To Judge; Additional Text; default final jgmt package

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit of Non-Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default & Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 11/29/2022; Party: Defendant Pinckney, Alexus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Additional Text; DESIGNATING AUTHORITY TO PROPERTY MANAGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Non-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; FOR TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less