This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 20:12:59 (UTC).

InjuryOne Inc Plaintiff vs. Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/11/2018 InjuryOne Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Windhaven Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Olga and Fry, John D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1939

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Olga

Fry, John D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

InjuryOne Inc

Durand, Guillermo

Defendant

Windhaven Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Richardson, Wallace L, II

Attorney at Windhaven Claims Management LLC

Po Box 269015

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing

12/27/2019 - Notice of Filing

Order Setting Case Management Conference

10/31/2019 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion to Compel

10/25/2019 - Motion to Compel

Order On Case Management Conference

10/23/2019 - Order On Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing By Judge

9/12/2019 - Notice of Hearing By Judge

Motion for Attorney Fees

3/26/2019 - Motion for Attorney Fees

Confession of Judgment

3/20/2019 - Confession of Judgment

Motion for Attorney Fees

10/2/2018 - Motion for Attorney Fees

Notice of Intent

10/1/2018 - Notice of Intent

Request to Produce

10/1/2018 - Request to Produce

Notice

10/1/2018 - Notice

Notice of Hearing

8/15/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Extension of Time

7/18/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Demand for Jury Trial

2/17/2018 - Demand for Jury Trial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/11/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/11/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Final Judgment

12/12/2019 - Final Judgment

Order of Dismissal

10/23/2019 - Order of Dismissal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116231970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 11-14-2019 11:OOAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; PL'S COUNSEL TO SUBMIT DETAILED TIMESHEETS ON SOUGHT ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND ABATE INTEREST; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal; Comment (Reservation of Jurisdiction to Determine Award of Attorney's Fees And Costs ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116134282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder On Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing By Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Party: Plaintiff InjuryOne Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfession of Judgment; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 80 Levine, Olga; Location: West Courtroom 220; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021532; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021532; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windhaven Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Injuryone Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Wallace L, II