This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2020 at 17:21:30 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Wyatt Morris Howard

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 In Re The Name Change of Wyatt Morris Howard was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ledee, Frank and Szorosy, Annette J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8170

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ledee, Frank

Magistrate

Szorosy, Annette J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Howard, Wyatt Morris

Wyatt Morrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (OF NAME CHANGE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115287138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketLetter Returned From Post Office; TO: WYATT MORRIS HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting; Name Change, on August 15, 2018 at 10:00a.m

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; Party: Petitioner Howard, Wyatt Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComment:; ** Not of Hrg and Envelope sent to Judge **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: WYATT M HOWARD ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20181YE1#001792; Comments: INDIGENT ; Reason: F09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketDetermination of Indigent Status - Indigent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketDisclosure from Non-Lawyer; Party: Petitioner Howard, Wyatt Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT); Party: Petitioner Howard, Wyatt Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Application Indigent Status; Party: Petitioner Howard, Wyatt Morris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less