This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:35:05 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Reynaldo Vergara Ferrer

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 In Re The Name Change of Reynaldo Vergara Ferrer was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Woods, Allana Robinson and Holden, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8301

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Woods, Allana Robinson

Judge

Holden, Peter

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ferrer, Reynaldo Vergara

Reina Vergara Ferrer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kaplan, Kenneth

Attorney at Kenneth M Kaplan Esquire

8603 South Dixie Higway Suite 412

Miami, FL 33143

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Comment (ADULT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115270009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketComment:; HRS FORM 427 MAILED TO CUST/PHILIPPINES; NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FJ ELECTRONICALLY SENT TO FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketComment:; Conf Env returned from Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketComment:; Conf Env taken to Judge for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Monday August 13, 2018 at 8:45am (Duplicate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Monday August 13, 2018 at 8:45am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; Party: Petitioner Ferrer, Reynaldo Vergara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: KENNETH M KAPLAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A091384; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Narrative of Certification of Birth; Party: Petitioner Ferrer, Reynaldo Vergara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Party: Petitioner Ferrer, Reynaldo Vergara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE (ADULT); Party: Petitioner Ferrer, Reynaldo Vergara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less