This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:17:52 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Rachelle Valere

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 In Re The Name Change of Rachelle Valere was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Matalon, Stephanie and Rothschild, Michael I.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3488

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Matalon, Stephanie

Judge

Rothschild, Michael I.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Valere, Rachelle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Comment (MINOR CHILD ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115386421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketComment:; HRS FORM 427 MAILED TO BVS/FL, NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FJ SENT TO FDLE ELECTRONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 10/10/18 @11:00am rm 11158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDirections to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; against KENNY FREDERICK; Party: Petitioner Valere, Rachelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; 4/25/18 KENNY FREDERICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: PHILIP KIM ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A046255; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketOrder; Transferring Case/FMCE 18-3488 is transferred to Div. 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Kenny Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; CRIMINAL BACKGROUND CHECK FOR: RACHELLE VALERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; f-14-12756 (44)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: PHILIP KIM ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A039405; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD(REN; Party: Petitioner Valere, Rachelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Petitioner Valere, Rachelle

    Read MoreRead Less