This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/20/2020 at 15:41:46 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Paula Camila Lopez Vargas

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 In Re The Name Change of Paula Camila Lopez Vargas was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ledee, Frank and Miller, Lucy Ramos. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7150

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ledee, Frank

Magistrate

Miller, Lucy Ramos

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lopez Vargas, Paula Camila

Paula Camila Tangu Walla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115271386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketComment:; HRS form 427 with NOTICE and CC FJ to Customer; Name Change Report placed inside CEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting; Name Change, on August 15, 2018 at 10:00a.m

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketComment:; NHEA w/env placed in case mgnt box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComment:; NOTICE OF HRG AND COPY OF FJ NAME CHANGE SENT TO CASE MGR - (NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: PAULA LOPEZ VARGAS ; Userid: CTS-carcher ; Receipt: 20181YE1A000818; Comments: VISA/ NSIS ; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: PAULA LOPEZ VARGAS ; Userid: CTS-carcher ; Receipt: 20181YE1A000818; Comments: VISA/ NSIS ; Amount: $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT; Party: Petitioner Lopez Vargas, Paula Camila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; None

    Read MoreRead Less