This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/10/2020 at 13:23:26 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Melody Elizabeth Requena

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 In Re The Name Change of Melody Elizabeth Requena was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Szorosy, Annette J. and Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Szorosy, Annette J.

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Requena, Melody Elizabeth

Gurrere, Melody Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Comment (ADULT ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115059214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDirections to the Clerk; This case is final as of the Order dated: May 3, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketComment:; HRS FORM 427 MAILED TO BVS/NJ, CC OF FJNC, NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FJ AND COPY OF CRIM HIST TO FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting Final Hrg/Pretrial Procedures; 05/03/2018 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; Criminal Background Check For: Melody Requena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MELODY E REQUENA ; Userid: CTS-acampos ; Receipt: 20181YE1Q000017; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME ADULT; Party: Petitioner Requena, Melody Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketDisclosure from Non-Lawyer; Sean Freeman; Party: Petitioner Requena, Melody Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases; There are no related cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less