This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2020 at 21:52:09 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Maria Pilar Mora

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 In Re The Name Change of Maria Pilar Mora was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Matalon, Stephanie and Cohen, Dale C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2253

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Matalon, Stephanie

Judge

Cohen, Dale C.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Mora, Maria Pilar

Abanto, Maria De Pilar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Comment (Amended ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115782358

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; Party: Petitioner Mora, Maria Pilar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketComment:; HRS form 427 with CC FJ and NOTICE to Customer; Name Change Report placed inside CEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMemo; CASE NOT READY FOR FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; May 2, 2019 at 10:00 am room 11-174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketComment:; Not of Hrg and Env sent to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MARIA MORA ; Userid: CTS-carcher ; Receipt: 20191YE1B000156; Comments: INDIGENT/ NSIS ; Reason: F09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: MARIA MORA ; Userid: CTS-carcher ; Receipt: 20191YE1B000157; Comments: CASH ; Amount: $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDetermination of Indigent Status - Indigent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME ADULT; Party: Petitioner Mora, Maria Pilar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Application Indigent Status; INDIGENT; Party: Petitioner Mora, Maria Pilar

    Read MoreRead Less