This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:16:33 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Lesley Anne Chen-Sem

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 In Re The Name Change of Lesley Anne Chen-Sem was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Miller, Lucy Ramos and Bailey, Dennis D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1484

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Miller, Lucy Ramos

Judge

Bailey, Dennis D.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Chen-Sem, Lesley Anne

Dodd, Lily Anne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114909714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCopy; HRS 427 Form, CC of FJU to BVS of Jacksonville, FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCopy; FDLE Form, T/C Criminal Background, CC of FJU to FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting; UNCONTESTED NAME CHANGE/ 2/22/18 AT 8:30AM RM 11-156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComment:; NHEA WITH ENVELOPE SENT TO CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; criminal background check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: LESLEY CHEN-SEM ; Userid: CTS-lwaters ; Receipt: 20181YE1M000183; Comments: PD W/VISA ; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: LESLEY CHEN-SEM ; Userid: CTS-lwaters ; Receipt: 20181YE1M000183; Comments: PD W/VISA ; Amount: $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT); Party: Petitioner Chen-Sem, Lesley Anne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketRelated Case(S); There are no related cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; None

    Read MoreRead Less