This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2020 at 01:21:31 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Esther Arana

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 In Re The Name Change of Esther Arana was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ledee, Frank and Matalon, Stephanie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7718

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ledee, Frank

Magistrate

Matalon, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Arana, Esther

Respondent

Salas, Danny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Costantino, Michael J

Attorney at New Horizons Law, P.A

2000 Banks Road, Suite218

Margate, FL 33063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketComment:; Form 427 w cc of fj sent to bvs/fl/// Customer will mail form 429 w check to bvs/fl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketComment:; name change report placed in confidential envelope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115310914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Against; Party: Respondent Salas, Danny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNo Mail Out

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Action; TO: DANNY SALAS /RETURN DATE AUG 17 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: NEW HORIZONS LAW, P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A085163; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search; Party: Petitioner Arana, Esther

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing; BIRTH CERTIFICATE; Party: Petitioner Arana, Esther

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; New Horizons Law, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketRecord; FOR ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less