This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/23/2020 at 15:53:17 (UTC).

In Re: The Name Change of :Angela Dale Wagoner

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 In Re The Name Change of Angela Dale Wagoner was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Matalon, Stephanie and Rothschild, Michael I.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9751

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Matalon, Stephanie

Judge

Rothschild, Michael I.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Wagoner, Angela Dale

Dale Wesley Korman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketComment:; Name change report placed in confidential envelope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketReport of Legal Name Change submitted to FDLE via CCH site

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DispositionFinal Judgment of Name Change; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115300966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketComment:; Envelope taken to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketComment:; Envelope returned from Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketOrder Setting; Uncontested Name Chane- 8/27/2018 9:00am #11158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketConfidential Envelope; Party: Petitioner Wagoner, Angela Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketComment:; ** Not of Hrg and envelope sent to Judge **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ANGELA D WAGONER ; Userid: CTS-lsantiago ; Receipt: 20181YE1R001250; Comments: VISA ; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNo Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketPetition; FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT; Party: Petitioner Wagoner, Angela Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; None

    Read MoreRead Less