This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/23/2023 at 22:56:54 (UTC).

In Re: Estate of: Trisciuzzi, Mae

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 In Re Estate of Trisciuzzi, Mae was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6575

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Alchenberger, Janet R

Trisciuzzi, Anthony

Decedent

Trisciuzzi, Mae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Adelson, Anthony S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Claim Mailed By Clerk; Additional Text; Florida Agency for Health Care Administration - not yet processed by clerk; Amount: $144,058.43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Claim Mailed By Clerk; Additional Text; Florida Agency for Health Care Administration - Mailed by clerk 04/13/23 jt; Amount: $144,058.43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketDescription: Order Determine Homestead Non-SRS; Additional Text; Signed 3/14/2023 Judge Lopane

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketDescription: Order; Additional Text; On the petition of Janet R. Alchenberger and ANTHONY TRISCIUZZI for summary administration of the estate of MAE TRISCIUZZI,- Signed 3/14/23 by Judge Lopane.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Affidavit Regarding Criminal History; Additional Text; Janet R. Alchenberger, affiant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Affidavit Regarding Criminal History; Additional Text; Anthony Trisciuzzi, affiant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketDescription: Original Will - Follow Up Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketDescription: Death Certificate - Follow Up Filing - Original

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketDescription: Summary Administration Less Than $ 1000 Filing Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for Summary Administration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Court Mandated Checklist - Summary Admin. Testate; Additional Text; Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Will Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Death Certificate; Additional Text; Party: Decedent Trisciuzzi, Mae

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Paid Funeral Bill

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Court Mandated Checklist - Determine Homestead; Additional Text; Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketDescription: Petition to Determine Homestead Real Property

[+] Read More [-] Read Less