This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 14:08:59 (UTC).

HSBC Bank USA NA Plaintiff vs. Vicente Losorelli Nitti, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 HSBC Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Vicente Losorelli Nitti, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2060

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC Bank USA NA

Defendants

Welleby Condominium Association

Losorelli Nitti, Vicente

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ullman, Zachary Y.

1615 S Congress Ave, Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

2/13/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

2/3/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/3/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/3/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Value Claim Form

2/3/2020 - Value Claim Form

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/3/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/3/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/11/20; Party: Defendant Welleby Condominium Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $99,915.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE; Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; ServiceMail@aldridgepite.com; Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Welleby Condominium Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VICENTE LOSORELLI NITTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Losorelli Nitti, Vicente

    Read MoreRead Less