This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/24/2022 at 04:31:43 (UTC).

Honeywoods Homeowners Association Inc Plaintiff vs. Lilla Mae Walker Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 Honeywoods Homeowners Association Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Lilla Mae Walker Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7674

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Honeywoods Homeowners Association Inc

Defendant

Walker, Lilla Mae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mulrey, Tara Nicole

Attorney at Straley Otto PA

2699 Stirling Road Suite C-207

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312-6541

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

5/25/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Lis Pendens

5/25/2022 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

5/25/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

5/25/2022 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Summons Returned Unserved

6/7/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

6/7/2022 - Summons Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 3rd day of June, 2022; Party: Defendant Walker, Lilla Mae

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Spouse of Lilla Mae Walker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Walker, Lilla Mae

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; attorney@straleyotto.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); TO FORECLOSE; Party: Plaintiff Honeywoods Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; TO: Lilla Mae Walker, Unknown Spouse of Lilla Mae Walker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less