This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 14:09:23 (UTC).

Hampton Lakes Associates LLC Plaintiff vs. Dwayne Johnson, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 Hampton Lakes Associates LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Dwayne Johnson, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1659

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hampton Lakes Associates LLC

Defendants

Johnson, Dwayne

Smith, Shanoyia Murray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simon, Charles

4987 North University Drive, #18A

Lauderhill, FL 33351

 

Court Documents

Summons Served-Posted

2/12/2018 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

2/12/2018 - Summons Served-Posted

Motion for Default & Default

2/12/2018 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Final Judgment

2/12/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

2/12/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

2/12/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Appearance

2/7/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

1/31/2018 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

1/31/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/15/2018 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114895287

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 2/1/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 2/1/18; Party: Defendant Smith, Shanoyia Murray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Smith, Shanoyia Murray; Party: Defendant Johnson, Dwayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Hampton Lakes Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Johnson, Dwayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Smith, Shanoyia Murray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Plaintiff Hampton Lakes Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: CL SIMON PA ; Userid: CTS-phormell ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000186; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CL SIMON PA ; Userid: CTS-phormell ; Receipt: 20183YF3D000186; Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; FOR TENANT EVICTION AND MONEY DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Party: Defendant Johnson, Dwayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Party: Defendant Smith, Shanoyia Murray

    Read MoreRead Less