This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/03/2021 at 18:56:58 (UTC).

H and J Contracting Inc Plaintiff vs. Jacobs Engineering Group Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/15/2015 H and J Contracting Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jacobs Engineering Group Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0110

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H and J Contracting Inc

Broward County, Florida

Defendants

Jacobs Engineering Group Inc

Edwards & Kelcey, Inc,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence, Joseph W, II

300 Sw 1St Avenue, Suite 150

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Arnold, Trevor B, ESQ.

Attorney at Gray Robinson PA

301 East Pine Street, Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32802-3068

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/16/2015 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Complaint (eFiled)

6/15/2015 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

6/15/2015 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

6/15/2015 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Appearance

6/17/2015 - Notice of Appearance

Affidavit of Service

6/29/2015 - Affidavit of Service

Request for Production

6/29/2015 - Request for Production

Motion for Extension of Time

7/6/2015 - Motion for Extension of Time

Exhibits

7/16/2015 - Exhibits

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Comment (NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP, INC. AS ITSELF AND AS ASSIGNEE OF EDWARDS & KELCEY, INC; Party: Plaintiff H and J Contracting Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; 16th day of June, 2015; Party: Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; TREVOR B. ARNOLD, ESQ. Florida Bar No.: 0545902; Party: Defendant Jacobs Engineering Group Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff H and J Contracting Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: JOSEPH W. LAWRENCE II ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A084075; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOSEPH W. LAWRENCE II ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A084075; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacobs Telecommunications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where H AND J CONTRACTING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARNOLD , TREVOR BOEHME