This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:09:47 (UTC).

Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County Plaintiff vs. Trueba Group Inc , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Trueba Group Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5731

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County

Defendants

Rodriguez Trueba, Daikel

Trueba Group Inc

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Petition (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Petition (eFiled)

Forfeiture Bond

9/23/2020 - Forfeiture Bond

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForfeiture Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Trueba Group, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Daikel Rodriguez-Trueba

    Read MoreRead Less