This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:33:45 (UTC).

Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County Plaintiff vs. Jerquian Brown, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Jerquian Brown, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5659

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Tony as Sheriff of Broward County

Defendants

Brown, Jerquian

In Re Forfeiture of: Six Thousand One Hundred Five Dollars ($6,105.00) In United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tsoubanos, Christian, ESQ.

Attorney at Gregory Tony Sheriff of Broward County

2601 West Broward Boulevard

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Petition (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Petition (eFiled)

Forfeiture Bond

9/23/2020 - Forfeiture Bond

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForfeiture Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Jerquian Brown

    Read MoreRead Less