This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/13/2021 at 18:50:44 (UTC).

Green Tree Servicing LLC Plaintiff vs. Anthony Armao, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/07/2014 Green Tree Servicing LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Anthony Armao, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3145

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Tree Servicing LLC

Defendants

Armao, Anthony

Armao, Elaine

Spring Valley Phase III Homeowners Association Inc

Spring Valley Property Owners Association Inc

United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service

Waterside at Spring Valley Homeowners Association Inc

Armao, Elaine T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mansoor, Nusrat

Defendant Attorneys

monioudis, Perry D, ESQ.

Wilder, Leonard

 

Court Documents

Order Setting

7/2/2015 - Order Setting

Order of Referral to General Magistrate

6/30/2015 - Order of Referral to General Magistrate

Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

6/29/2015 - Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial

Order On Case Management Conference

5/12/2015 - Order On Case Management Conference

Order Setting Case Management Conference

5/11/2015 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion for Extension of Time

5/1/2015 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing

4/22/2015 - Notice of Filing

Order of Referral to General Magistrate

3/24/2015 - Order of Referral to General Magistrate

Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic

9/24/2014 - Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic

Notice of Appearance

8/11/2014 - Notice of Appearance

Summons Returned Served

8/6/2014 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/6/2014 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance

7/7/2014 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/7/2014 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/7/2014 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/7/2014 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Filing

7/7/2014 - Notice of Filing

Final Judgment

9/29/2015 - Final Judgment

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION/ MOLA R BOSLAND FBN: 30330

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Title

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2015
View Court Documents

DocketBid Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Sale

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2015

HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2015

DocketForeclosure Sale Fee; Payor: COLLINS MALLARD ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20151RA1A022480; Amount: $70.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Costs & Interest; ADDITIONAL/AND PAYMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Sale - Issued by Attorney; on December 1, 2015, at 10:00 AM,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2015
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Publication; 12/01/15 SALE DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2015

DocketComment:; File Created for original Note and Mortgage documents 10/22/15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Spring Valley Property Owners Association Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Spring Valley Phase III Homeowners Association Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; to: Unknown Tenant #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Armao, Elaine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Armao, Anthony

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Green Tree Servicing LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; pltf's certification of original note; Party: Plaintiff Green Tree Servicing LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketValue Claim Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Plaintiff Green Tree Servicing LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less