This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/30/2020 at 00:26:23 (UTC).

Green Leaf Company Inc., et al Plaintiff vs. Espiova Holdings LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Green Leaf Company Inc , Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Espiova Holdings LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7430

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Escobar de Vargas, Barbara Susana

Los Palos International Corp.

Green Leaf Company Inc.

Sanint Gutierrez, Margarita Maria

Moving Nature Limited

Defendants

Espinoza, Alida B

Espiova Holdings LLC

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrillo, Felix R

Defendant Attorneys

Larrabure, Maria L

Wilder, Leonard

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

3/26/2020 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

3/11/2020 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

3/11/2020 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale

3/9/2020 - Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale

Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale

3/9/2020 - Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale

Notice of Hearing

3/5/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

3/5/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale

3/5/2020 - Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale

Notice of Unavailability

2/13/2020 - Notice of Unavailability

Proof of Publication

1/28/2020 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Filing

1/7/2020 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Service

1/7/2020 - Notice of Service

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

1/7/2020 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Order to Show Cause

1/6/2020 - Order to Show Cause

Stipulation

1/6/2020 - Stipulation

Stipulation

1/3/2020 - Stipulation

Order to Show Cause

12/20/2019 - Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause

12/17/2019 - Order to Show Cause

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com; CANCELED: Per Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com; CANCELED: Per Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Sale - Issued by Attorney; 10:00 o'clock A.M. on the 15111 day of April, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Party: Ricky Crumpton; SBA# 20-13346-SMG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale; granted reset 4-15-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale; April 15, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale; Party: Defendant Espiova Holdings LLC; Party: Defendant Espinoza, Alida B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Alida B. Espinoza

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ESPIOVA HOLDINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Sunset Falls Homeowners Association, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less