This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/29/2020 at 20:09:27 (UTC).

GL Staffing Services Inc, et al Plaintiff vs. Prime Homebuilders Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 GL Staffing Services Inc, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Prime Homebuilders Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0626

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Prime Investors and Developers LLC

Greenfield, Steven B.

Prime Homebuilders

of Flager Village Land Trust

GL Staffing Services Inc

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Greenfield, Steven B

Prime Investors and Developers, LLC

Prime Homebuilders

Prime Homebuilders Inc

of Flager Village Land Trust

GL Staffing Services Inc

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bennett, Geoffrey C, ESQ.

Attorney at Geoffrey C Bennett PA

4651 Sheridan Street, Suite 490

Hollywood, FL 33021

Ortiz, Leonardo N, Jr.

Attorney at Leonardo Ortiz, P.A

1909 Harrison Street, Suite 208

Hollywood, FL 33020

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

11/22/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Interrogatories

11/22/2019 - Interrogatories

Summons Returned Served

10/25/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Response to Request for Production

10/23/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Second Amended Complaint

10/5/2019 - Second Amended Complaint

eSummons Issuance - On Amended

10/5/2019 - eSummons Issuance - On Amended

Agreed Order

10/4/2019 - Agreed Order

Agreed Order

10/4/2019 - Agreed Order

Motion for Leave to Amend

9/20/2019 - Motion for Leave to Amend

Motion

9/12/2019 - Motion

Motion to Compel

9/9/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

8/14/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Amended Answer & Counterclaim

7/24/2019 - Amended Answer & Counterclaim

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

7/23/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer

7/23/2019 - Answer

Request for Production

7/16/2019 - Request for Production

Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint

5/24/2019 - Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint

Mediation Report

5/13/2019 - Mediation Report

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionAgreed Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116281383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Pursuant to Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation for Dismissal; Comment (JOINT STIPULATION ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116253668

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; Party: Defendant Prime Investors and Developers, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 10/22/19; Party: Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LEONARDO ORTIZ P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A187118; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - On Amended; Party: Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; summs served 09/04/18; Party: Defendant Greenfield, Steven B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; summs served 09/04/18; Party: Defendant Prime Homebuilders Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Stven B Greenfield

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Prime Homebuilders Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff GL Staffing Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: LEONARDO ORTIZ P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A117614; Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LEONARDO ORTIZ P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A117614; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: LEONARDO ORTIZ P.A. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A117614; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where of Flager Village Land Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where GL STAFFING SERV INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime Investors & Developers LLC is a litigant