This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/13/2020 at 12:57:31 (UTC).

GK Weston Corporate Center LLC Plaintiff vs. Marty Kiar, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/06/2017 GK Weston Corporate Center LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Marty Kiar, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2071

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GK Weston Corporate Center LLC

Defendants

Biegalski, Leon M

Zingale, Jim

Kiar, Marty

Kennedy, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodriguez, Carlos F

Defendant Attorneys

White, Ryann Elise

Dennis, Timothy E, ESQ.

Sherman, Richard A

Schwartzreich, Mila K

Teitler, Robert Lon

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

6/8/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice

8/1/2019 - Notice

Notice of Unavailability

7/12/2019 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Appearance

6/6/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order for Substitution of Counsel

5/15/2019 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/14/2019 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Unavailability

8/9/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

3/5/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Summons Returned Served

2/19/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Answer to Complaint

2/16/2018 - Answer to Complaint

Answer

2/6/2018 - Answer

Answer

2/1/2018 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

2/1/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Summons Returned Served

1/25/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

1/25/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Appearance

1/24/2018 - Notice of Appearance

eSummons Issuance

1/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; DESICNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE AND CHANGE OF COUNSEL/ DEFENDANT BROWARD COUNTY/ ATTORNEY JAVIER NAVAS FBN: 1010355

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice; OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS/Defendant Executive Director of the State of Florida Department of Revene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Substitution of Counsel; Defendant, Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Substitution of Counsel; MILA K. SCHWARTZREICH, ESQ FBN 85634; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; 18th day of January, 201 8; Party: Defendant Biegalski, Leon M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer to Complaint; Party: Defendant Biegalski, Leon M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
01/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Ryann E. White, FBN 123964

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARLOS F RODRIGUEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006988; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARLOS F RODRIGUEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006988; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: CARLOS F RODRIGUEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006988; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; MARTY KIAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; THOMAS KENNEDY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; LEON M. BIEGALSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2017

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: CARLOS F RODRIGUEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A166960; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less