This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/16/2020 at 19:03:15 (UTC).

GEODIS USA INC Plaintiff vs. NORDIC MADE INC Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 GEODIS USA INC Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against NORDIC MADE INC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7874

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEODIS USA INC

Defendant

NORDIC MADE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gartner, Lee

Attorney at Lee B. Gartner, P.A

1440 Coral Ridge Drive, Suite 221

Coral Springs, FL 33071

Defendant Attorney

Stone, Todd I

Attorney at Stone Law Group

101 N.E 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1250

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution

4/24/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution

Motion for Protective Order

3/11/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Taking Deposition

2/23/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served

1/8/2019 - Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served

Notice of Hearing

9/21/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Affidavit of Indebtedness

9/16/2018 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Notice of Filing Affidavit

9/16/2018 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

9/4/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/1/2018 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Agreed Order

7/30/2018 - Agreed Order

Motion for Enlargement of Time

7/27/2018 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Summons Returned Served

7/18/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Filing

7/2/2018 - Notice of Filing

eSummons Issuance

6/29/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

6/29/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/29/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Satisfaction of Judgment

6/26/2019 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Summary Final Judgment

10/24/2018 - Summary Final Judgment

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionSatisfaction of Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115903675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution; to : MICHAEL RASMUSSEN OR JOE ENGER; Party: Plaintiff GEODIS USA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Party: Defendant NORDIC MADE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; MICHAEL RASMUSSEN OR JOE ENGER ON 3/11/19 @ 2:15PM; Party: Plaintiff GEODIS USA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena for Deposition Returned Served; 1-7-19/MICHAEL RASMUSSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionSummary Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115407625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Plaintiff GEODIS USA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; granting Defendant's motion for enlargement of time to file a response by 08/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant NORDIC MADE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7-11-18; Party: Defendant NORDIC MADE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: BROOKE GARTNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A089534; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: BROOKE GARTNER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A089534; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geodis USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stone, Todd I