This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/25/2020 at 17:05:28 (UTC).

Gene B Glick Co Inc Plaintiff vs. Claudette Johnson Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Gene B Glick Co Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Claudette Johnson Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miranda, Giuseppina. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7824

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miranda, Giuseppina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gene B Glick Co Inc

Cambridge Square Hollywood, A limited Partnership

Defendant

Johnson, Claudette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schechter, Jerome R, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Non-Military Affidavit

12/27/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

12/27/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Affidavit

12/27/2019 - Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

12/22/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Summons Served-Posted

12/13/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

12/10/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

12/2/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

12/2/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Default Judgment for Eviction

1/9/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Plaintiff; (mail)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Comment ((1/8/2020) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116280351

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Gene B Glick Co Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; December 6, 2019; Party: Defendant Johnson, Claudette

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Johnson, Claudette

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less