This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/23/2020 at 17:30:19 (UTC).

Gene B Glick Co Inc Plaintiff vs. Blair Brand Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Gene B Glick Co Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Blair Brand Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Betsy. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1959

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Betsy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gene B Glick Co Inc

Defendant

Brand, Blair

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schechter, Jerome R, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order Striking Defendant's Answer

2/13/2020 - Order Striking Defendant's Answer

Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

2/10/2020 - Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/10/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Judge's Review Notes on Tenant Evictions

2/5/2020 - Judge's Review Notes on Tenant Evictions

Answer to Tenant Eviction

2/3/2020 - Answer to Tenant Eviction

Summons Served-Posted

2/2/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

1/31/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/24/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/13/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Attorney; -Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116352129

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Striking Defendant's Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Defendant's Answer; and For Entry of Default; Party: Plaintiff Gene B Glick Co Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; Party: Plaintiff Gene B Glick Co Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudge's Review Notes on Tenant Evictions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Tenant Eviction; Party: Defendant Brand, Blair

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; Defendant's Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; January 29,2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Party: Defendant Brand, Blair

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less