This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2020 at 17:25:42 (UTC).

Gary Michel Plaintiff vs. Michael Boudreau Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Gary Michel Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Michael Boudreau Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1758

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michel, Gary

Defendant

Boudreau, Michael

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default & Default

2/3/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/3/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Summons Served-Posted

1/27/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Notice of Filing

1/27/2020 - Notice of Filing

Complaint

1/23/2020 - Complaint

Non-Military Affidavit

1/23/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Civil Cover Sheet

1/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/5/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Plaintiff; ************Hold Folder***********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116333463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; -----------X; Party: Plaintiff Michel, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; ---------X; Party: Plaintiff Michel, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 01/24/2020; Party: Defendant Boudreau, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Status Report- Non military; Party: Defendant Boudreau, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less