This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/14/2020 at 14:04:22 (UTC).

Ft. Lauderdale Falcon Hotel LLC Plaintiff vs. Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 Ft Lauderdale Falcon Hotel LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2752

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ft. Lauderdale Falcon Hotel LLC

Defendant

Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniels, Elizabeth J

Defendant Attorney

Milledge, David Francis

 

Court Documents

Agreed Final Judgment

2/11/2019 - Agreed Final Judgment

Petition (eFiled)

12/15/2017 - Petition (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

12/15/2017 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

12/28/2017 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

12/28/2017 - eSummons Issuance

Answer

1/11/2018 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

1/11/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Answer

1/25/2018 - Answer

Notice of Unavailability

3/5/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

8/9/2018 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Filing

11/2/2018 - Notice of Filing

Motion for Entry

2/8/2019 - Motion for Entry

 

Docket Entries

02/11/2019
View Court Documents

DispositionAgreed Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 115613534

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2019

DispositionDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Entry; OF AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; DESIGNATION OF EMAIL; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Marty Kiar, as Broward County Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2017

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC J. BROOKS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A177945; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2017

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC J. BROOKS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A177945; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2017
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; MARTY KIAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2017
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Broward County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2017

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ERIC J. BROOKS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A171737; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less