This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/03/2020 at 16:26:25 (UTC).

Franco's Cocktail Products Inc Plaintiff vs. Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Franco's Cocktail Products Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9192

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franco's Cocktail Products Inc

Defendant

Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lopez, Javier Asis

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 900

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6039

Tropin, Harley Shepard

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton PA

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33131-2335

Florio, Frank Anthony

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

McQuilkin, Gail

Attorney at KOZYAK TROPIN & THROCKMORTON, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon, 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Widlanski, Benjamin Jacobs

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 9

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6039

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance

6/4/2020 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance

Civil Cover Sheet

6/3/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

6/3/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; MITSUI SUMITOMO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Franco's Cocktail Products Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITSUI SUMITOMO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tropin, Harley Shepard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gail A Mcquilkin