This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/08/2023 at 15:40:33 (UTC).

Four Blr Doors Corp Plaintiff vs. Kelsan Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Four Blr Doors Corp Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kelsan Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2939

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Four Blr Doors Corp

FB Doors

Defendants

Kelsan Inc

Jackson 4326 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Torres, Nabila

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

6/28/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Final Order of Dismissal

7/22/2021 - Final Order of Dismissal

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/6/2021 - Notice of Lis Pendens

eSummons Issuance

7/6/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/6/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Discharge of Lis Pendens

7/19/2021 - Discharge of Lis Pendens

Motion to Dismiss

7/19/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2021
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Final Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 117448473

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion to Dismiss; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Four Blr Doors Corp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Discharge of Lis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; JACKSON 4326 LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; KELSAN, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Lis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $30,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Four Blr Doors Corp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less