This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 17:44:11 (UTC).

Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc Plaintiff vs. Geico Indemnity Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1822

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

DPI Of Plantation

Samanez, Nicole

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Attorney at Schiller, Kessler, & Gomez PLC

7501 West Oakland Park Blvd, Second Floor

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorney

Baez, Michelle M

Attorney at The Law Office of George L. Cimballa III

6700 North Andres Avenue, Suite 404

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

11/19/2019 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Agreed Order

1/18/2019 - Agreed Order

Response to Request for Admissions

1/10/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

1/10/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

1/10/2019 - Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply

1/8/2019 - Reply

Motion for Leave

1/7/2019 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/3/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Compel

11/6/2018 - Motion to Compel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/25/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/27/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

3/26/2018 - Notice of Service on Ins Commissioner

Request for Admissions

2/6/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

2/6/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/6/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/6/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/6/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

11/27/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116204230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENES; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave; to serve additional req for admissions/attached; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Ins Commissioner; 2/8/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018779; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: THEOPHILOS GEORGE POULOPOULOS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018779; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff Fort Lauderdale Mobile Ultrasound, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Party: Defendant Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less