This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/01/2020 at 01:48:07 (UTC).

Forethought Life Insurance Company Plaintiff vs. Donald Caputo, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Forethought Life Insurance Company Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Donald Caputo, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8362

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forethought Life Insurance Company

Defendants

13 DJD Investment Systems LLC

Caputo, Donald

Cypress Head Club Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hearne, Matthew Edward, ESQ.

Attorney at Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP

One E. Broward Blvd., Suite 1430

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Botsford, Bruce C

Attorney at Bruce Botsford, P.A.

1615 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33315

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

6/8/2020 - Motion to Compel

Order Setting Case Management Conference

6/8/2020 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion for Order to Show Cause

4/13/2020 - Motion for Order to Show Cause

Certificate of Service

4/9/2020 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting Case Management Conference

4/7/2020 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

4/6/2020 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/1/2020 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

3/31/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

3/31/2020 - Request for Production

Complaint (eFiled)

9/3/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/3/2019 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Value Claim Form

9/3/2019 - Value Claim Form

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/3/2019 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

9/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/3/2019 - eSummons Issuance

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Party: Plaintiff Forethought Life Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 07-08-2020 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order to Show Cause; Party: Plaintiff Forethought Life Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 06-08-2020 1:30 PM; ROOM 15160

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Party: Plaintiff Forethought Life Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); to foreclose mortgage

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; DONALD CAPUTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; 1314 DJD INVESTMENT SYSTEMS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; CYPRESS HEAD CLUB, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less