Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 15:12:47 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC Plaintiff vs. Jason G Cedeno Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jason G Cedeno Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1599

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Lincoln Automotive Financial Services

Defendant

Cedeno, Jason G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ingino, Michael James

Attorney at Moody, Jones & Ingino, P.A

1333 S. University Drive, Suite 201

Plantation, FL 33324-4001

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/22/2021 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Civil Cover Sheet

2/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/12/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 80 Levine, Olga; Location: https://17thflcourts.zoom.us/j/489403007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James